Azabi, Tareq Omar S (CPSO#: 72883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210A
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone: (905) 685-0821
Fax: (905) 685-1175
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

210A
282 LINWELL ROAD
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 685-0821
Fax: (905) 685-1175
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tareq Azabi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Azabi ( CPSO# 72883 )

Business Address:
Suite 210A
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 685-0821

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREQ OMAR S AZABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 06 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2000 to 06 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2001 to 06 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2002 to 06 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2004