Azad, Sanjay Mahendra (CPSO#: 100465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2013

Expiry Date:  08 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Armed Forces Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 360 3rd Floor
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 345-5455
Fax: (807) 345-5456
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Azad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Azad ( CPSO# 100465)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 360 3rd Floor
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 345-5455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sanjay Mahendra Azad may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that is approved by the Chair, Division of Clinical
                        Sciences, Northern  Ontario  School  of Medicine, in which Dr. Azad
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Azad  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Azad's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Azad's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 29, 2013, and currently has an  interim
                  expiry  date of May 8, 2019.  The expiry date of this certificate may  be
                  extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.