Azakie, Anthony (CPSO#: 72833)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001