Azarpazhooh, Mahmoud Reza (CPSO#: 108025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 07 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Neurological Science
Room C 7002
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3696
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD REZA AZARPAZHOOH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AZARPAZHOOH is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. AZARPAZHOOH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AZARPAZHOOH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AZARPAZHOOH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AZARPAZHOOH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AZARPAZHOOH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Oct 2015 to 06 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018