Azcue, Maria Da Piedade Pizarro De Sande E Lemos (CPSO#: 60585)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1986

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999