Azer, Nivin Fahmy Tawfik (CPSO#: 82080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 130
30 Stephen Street
Morden MB  R6M 2B3
Phone: (204) 822-4474

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIVIN FAHMY TAWFIK AZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012