Azhar, Ahmad Saeed Ahmad (CPSO#: 65986)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1998