Azharuddin, Mohammed (CPSO#: 87913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Kakatiya Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2119 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Oak Clinic
Unit C2
2524 Third Line
Oakville ON  L6M 0G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 827-7000
Fax: (905) 827-7755
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Azharuddin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azharuddin ( CPSO# 87913 )

Business Address:
2119 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Business Address:
2525 Third Line
Unit C2
Oakville ON  L6M 0G8
Phone Number: (905) 827-7000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AZHARUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZHARUDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 10 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012