Aziz, Abdul (CPSO#: 78460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy Medical Clinic
Unit 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone: (905) 455-5445
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 2 2007


Corporation Name: Dr.Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aziz ( CPSO# 78460 )

Business Address:
105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Phone Number: (905) 789-1750

Business Address:
Unit 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445


Corporation Name: Doctors Aziz, Cheema, and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Abdul  Aziz  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Paediatrics  and
            Neonatology, only.