Aziz, Muhammed Shahid (CPSO#: 50103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines Hospital Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 45133
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

127 Westmore Drive Unit 103
Toronto ON  M9V3Y6
Canada
Phone: 416 749 3933
Fax: 416 749 3936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahid Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aziz ( CPSO# 50103 )

Business Address:
St Catharines Hospital Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMED SHAHID AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1997