Aziz, Surreyya Yasmin (CPSO#: 69797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Origyns
1355 Bank St, Suite 205
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 06 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 06 May 2008 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 6, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Surreyya Yasmin Aziz:

                  Dr. Aziz is required to apply to the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                  of Ontario before commencing any practice in colposcopy.