Aziz, Zared Al (CPSO#: 76308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of General Pathology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 6285
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZARED AL AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006