Aziza, Jonathan (CPSO#: 54826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8107
Fax: (416) 431-8141
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

X-Ray Department
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-6636
Fax: (416) 438-6008
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Aziza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )

Business Address:
X-Ray Department
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN AZIZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1984