Azoubel, Gustavo Alberto Paes (CPSO#: 83908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave east
Suite # 502
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (647) 748-8272
Fax: (647) 748-8273
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gustavo Azoubel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Azoubel ( CPSO# 83908 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 502
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (647) 748-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ALBERTO PAES AZOUBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZOUBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010