Azuelos, Ilan (CPSO#: 97416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAN AZUELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZUELOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2012 to 08 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017