First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |