First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jan 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Feb 2022 |