Yemchuk, Bohdan Roman (CPSO#: 51884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. R. Yemchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Westmount Mall
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. P. Fox ( CPSO# 57143 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOHDAN ROMAN YEMCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEMCHUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1983