Baath, Kulrajbir Singh (CPSO#: 84506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Building
955 Queen Street East
Unit 225
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: 705-450-0100
Fax: 705-450-0102
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.S.Baath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Baath ( CPSO# 84506 )

Business Address:
207 - 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 794-4497

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULRAJBIR SINGH BAATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010