Babakkor, Mohammed Ahmed Omar (CPSO#: 92537)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2014 to 27 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015