Babaran, Shirley De La Cruz (CPSO#: 77311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Umbalin, Shirley De La Cruz (used until: 13 Jul 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ilocano, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-245-2463
Fax: 705-245-0135
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley Babaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Babaran ( CPSO# 77311 )

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrew Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 245-2463

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY DE LA CRUZ BABARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015