Babcock, Lea Janine (CPSO#: 66384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Babcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Babcock ( CPSO# 66384 )

Business Address:
201B - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 325-4535

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Victoria Archer 201-119 Memorial Ave Orillia ON L3V 5X1 Tel: (705) 326-934
Date Received: 20 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEA JANINE BABCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABCOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995