Babcook, Catherine Jean (CPSO#: 58026)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2002