Babensee, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58110)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2010