Babyn, Paul Sheppard (CPSO#: 57491)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011