Bacani, Julinor Taciena Carlos (CPSO#: 74784)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 May 2000 to 23 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2001 to 21 Dec 2001
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2001