Bacchus, Joanne Nadira (CPSO#: 56720)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998