Bacchus, Rahman (CPSO#: 31241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 254-4511
Fax: (519) 254-7226
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bacchus ( CPSO# 31241 )

Business Address:
7 - 1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 254-4511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHMAN BACCHUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACCHUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1979