Bachrach, Laura Keyes (CPSO#: 53286)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tufts University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Feb 1987