Bacigaluppi, Susanna (CPSO#: 90012)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universita di Milano, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 23 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2009