Backman, Stephanie Anne (CPSO#: 88932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 8208
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-2651
Fax: (519) 371-6178
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Backman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Backman ( CPSO# 88932 )

Business Address:
Suite 8209
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE BACKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013