Backstein, David Jon (CPSO#: 66712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 476 (D)
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8457
Fax: (416) 586-8678
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Backstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Backstein ( CPSO# 66712 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 476(D)
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8457

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JON BACKSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000