Backstein, Robert Steven (CPSO#: 68106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5109 Steeles Avenue West, Unit 300
Toronto ON  M9L 2Y8
Phone: (416) 663-9649
Fax: (416) 663-7407
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Backstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Backstein ( CPSO# 68106 )

Business Address:
Unit 300
5109 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  M9L 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 663-9649

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STEVEN BACKSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1999