Backway, Karen Lynn (CPSO#: 75789)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Backway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2001 to 04 Feb 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017