Bacon, Siobhan (CPSO#: 113719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
431-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4852
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIOBHAN BACON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BACON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BACON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BACON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BACON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BACON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BACON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017