Bacskai, Istvan Steve (CPSO#: 68188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Pecs, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
356-B Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3V6
Phone: (613) 729-8278
Fax: (613) 729-8359
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bacskai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bacskai ( CPSO# 68188 )

Business Address:
356-B Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3V6
Phone Number: (613) 729-8278

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISTVAN STEVE BACSKAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACSKAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996