Badali, Mary Ann (CPSO#: 50108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Ann Badali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Badali ( CPSO# 50108 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
C753 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANN BADALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984