Badawi, Abdelrahman Kha.Ahmed (CPSO#: 82329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aldara Hospital and Medical Center
Olaya Main Rd
Tarim Tower BOX 1105 Riyadh -11431
Riyadh 11431
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966(11)420-78

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDELRAHMAN KHA.AHMED BADAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 08 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2006 to 10 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2007 to 10 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2008 to 10 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2009 to 10 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010