Badawi, Ibrahim Ahmed (CPSO#: 54892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Riyadh, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Sep 1990
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1990