Badcock, Beverley Suzanne (CPSO#: 60359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 4228
Fax: (705) 328-6121
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasik Cataract Centre
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beverley Badcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Badcock ( CPSO# 60359 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLEY SUZANNE BADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADCOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1988 to 11 Nov 1988
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1998