Bader, Russell Todd (CPSO#: 88415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (866) 539-7944
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Bader Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bader ( CPSO# 88415 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 856-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL TODD BADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012