Badiwala, Mitesh Vallabh (CPSO#: 80994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiovascular Sugery
4N-472
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4720
Fax: (416) 340-3751
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitesh Badiwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Badiwala ( CPSO# 80994 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
4N-472
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4720

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITESH VALLABH BADIWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADIWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2014