Badner, Neal Hartley (CPSO#: 54020)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neal Badner Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Campus Department of Anesthesia 800 Commissioner's Road East London, ON N6A 4G7
Date Received: 30 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014