Badoe, Kwame Ebule (CPSO#: 50107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Nzema

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1499 Gordon St
Guelph ON  N1L 0L5
Phone: 519 527 9294
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. E. Badoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWAME EBULE BADOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADOE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984