Baechler, Marion Genevieve (CPSO#: 63665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201- 348 Muskoka Road #3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-6137
Fax: (705) 789-6175
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marion Baechler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baechler ( CPSO# 63665 )

Business Address:
201 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-6137

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARION GENEVIEVE BAECHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAECHLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1992