Baetz, Tara Dawn (CPSO#: 68981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontar
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630 Ext. 4503
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara Baetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Baetz ( CPSO# 68981 )

Business Address:
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA DAWN BAETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAETZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2001