Bagg, Stephen Donald (CPSO#: 57187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53296
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen D. Bagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bagg ( CPSO# 57187 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's Of The Lake Hospital
340 Union Street
Postal Bag 3600
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 544-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DONALD BAGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988