Bagga, Amit (CPSO#: 68766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Kidney Function Clinic
# 204 - 1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (519) 946-9994
Fax: (519) 946-9979
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dialysis Unit
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 2115
Fax: (519) 255-2215
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amit Bagga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagga ( CPSO# 68766 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 946-9994

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT BAGGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1999