Baggs, Douglas Keith (CPSO#: 56921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Flying Doctor Service
Waldron Road
Port Hedland
WA, 6721
Port Hedland 6721
Australia
Phone: +61 447280025

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS KEITH BAGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001