Bagis, Mariam Hamad S (CPSO#: 105732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-946-3079
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM HAMAD S BAGIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAGIS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BAGIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAGIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BAGIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAGIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAGIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018